Bordman, Zachary Nathaniel (CPSO#: 106507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-978-6976
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Bordman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bordman ( CPSO# 55786 )
Dr. R. Bordman ( CPSO# 58143 )
Dr. Z. Bordman ( CPSO# 106507)

Business Address:
1896 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 2J6
Phone Number: (647) 344-8881

Business Address:
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3P4
Phone Number: (416) 443-1074

Business Address:
550 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 2M2
Phone Number: (416) 226-1331

Business Address:
3250 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H6
Phone Number: (416) 261-2111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZACHARY NATHANIEL BORDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017