Bordoff, Benjamin (CPSO#: 59762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
267 Pelissier Street
Suite 301
Windsor ON  N9A 4K4
Phone: (519) 253-4606
Fax: (519) 253-1854
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Windsor
Student Health Services
242 CAW Student Centre
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-7002
Fax: (519) 971-3637
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BORDOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDOFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989