Borek, Christopher Michael (CPSO#: 92968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Borek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Borek ( CPSO# 92968 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BOREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOREK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2013