Borenstein, Steven Howard (CPSO#: 66923)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 03 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007