Borgaonkar, Mark Ram (CPSO#: 70806)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 1996 to 27 Sep 1996
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012