Borger, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 69301)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Andrew Borger to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 30, 2017:

Dr. Borger has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.