Boright, Andrew Pepler (CPSO#: 65047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Boright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boright ( CPSO# 65047 )

Business Address:
LMC Endocrinology
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW PEPLER BORIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORIGHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993