Borkovich, Renee Michelle (CPSO#: 104662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022 Ext. 2379
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M6M2
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE MICHELLE BORKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORKOVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2016 to 18 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2016