Born, Abraham (CPSO#: 29560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4800 Leslie Street
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 225-9299
Fax: (416) 225-7304
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Born Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Born ( CPSO# 29560 )

Business Address:
302 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 225-9299

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM BORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1976 to 17 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1977