Bornstein, Jason Steven (CPSO#: 84803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON STEVEN BORNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011