Boron, Susan Pearl (CPSO#: 28054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Boron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boron ( CPSO# 28054 )

Business Address:
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 25, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Susan Pearl Boron, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Boron has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                                   UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND 

                                          ("Undertaking") of

                                         DR. SUSAN PEARL BORON
                                           ("Dr. Boron") to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Boron, certificate of registration number 28054, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that the College had a compliance monitoring
                  file bearing File Number AMS 264244 with respect to an Undertaking that I
                  entered into with the College on June 24, 2014 ("2014 Undertaking").
                  Pursuant to the 2014 Undertaking my family medicine practice was
                  reassessed in 2016.

            (4)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that this Undertaking is a result of the
                  reassessment of my family medicine practice in 2016, and understand that
                  this Undertaking replaces and supercedes the 2014 Undertaking.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least six (6) months upon my return to
                        practice ("Clinical Supervision") as outlined in the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", the
                        Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached hereto as Appendix
                        "B", and as set out below:
                  
                        (i)   Moderate Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Boron, undertake that initially I will practise
                                    under moderate level supervision of the Clinical
                                    Supervisor ("Moderate Level Supervision") for a period
                                    of two (2) months.
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that during the period of
                                    Moderate Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will meet with me at least once every two (2) weeks to
                                    review at least ten (10) of my patient charts.
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that during the Moderate
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will observe
                                    me in practice for two (2) half day sessions with a
                                    minimum of five (5) patient encounters each half day.
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that during the period of
                                    Moderate Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will submit written reports to the College monthly.
                  
                        (ii)  Low Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that if my Clinical
                                    Supervisor reports to the College that satisfactory
                                    progress has been made during the period of Moderate
                                    Level Supervision, the College may, in its discretion,
                                    reduce the frequency of supervision to a low level
                                    ("Low Level Supervision") for a period of four (4)
                                    months.
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that during the period of Low
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will meet
                                    with me monthly to review at least ten (10) of my
                                    patient charts.
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that during the period of Low
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will submit
                                    written reports to the College monthly.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of
                        the Clinical Supervisor(s). In addition to the duties set out
                        above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:

                        (i)   Facilitate the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for the
                              first two (2) months and once every month for the remaining
                              four (4) months;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews or direct
                              observation;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        assessor, dated January 11, 2017, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to obtain the approval of the College
                        regarding my Clinical Supervisor in advance of my return to
                        practice and, once I have received approval in writing from the
                        College, I further undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College at least fifteen
                        (15) days before I return to practice.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.

                  (g)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will not return to practice or will cease practising
                        medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education
                        ("Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   the CMPA e Learning Programs (2 modules); and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to complete this requirement during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision or, if no satisfactory program is
                        available within that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College ("Assessor(s)"). I acknowledge
                        that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.

                  (b)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard. I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Boron, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        Public Register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code:
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake to inform the College of any and all
                        locations where I intend to practise or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)") in advance of
                        returning to practice.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake, after my return to practice, to inform the
                        College of each and every additional Practice Location, within five
                        (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Boron, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Boron, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Boron, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        An assessment of Dr. Boron's practice was conducted by the College.
                        As a result of the assessment, upon her return to practice:
                  
                        *     Dr. Boron will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.
                        *     Dr. Boron will engage in professional education in
                              record-keeping and documentation.
                        *     Dr. Boron's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Boron, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Boron, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Boron, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or

                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Susan Pearl Boron to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2018:

An assessment of Dr. Boron’s practice was conducted by the College. As a result of the assessment, upon her return to practice:

Dr. Boron will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.


Dr. Boron will engage in professional education in record-keeping and documentation.

Dr. Boron’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.