Borowska, Anna Maria (CPSO#: 61219)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993