Borrajo, Cesareo Perez (CPSO#: 19767)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Santiago, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Apr 2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2004