Borsato, Garry Wayne (CPSO#: 62917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radiology Consultants Associated
Suite 120
6707 Elbow Drive Southwest
Calgary AB  T2V 0E3
Phone: (403) 777-3007
Fax: (403) 777-3008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 24, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Garry Wayne Borsato,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Borsato to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Borsato's practice is restricted to interventional radiology. He may
                  only perform ultrasound and fluoroscopic interventions.  Dr. Borsato may
                  not perform or engage in any type of surgery, including cardiac surgery.