Borsato, Stephanie Ann (CPSO#: 73392)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Maki, Stephanie Ann (used until: 06 Nov 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 766 Pleasant Valley Road, Espanola P5E 1P9
Date Received: 01 Apr 2015


Instructions: Patients may send a written request for their records to 256 Centre Street, Espanola, ON P5E 1G2
Date Received: 01 Nov 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015