Borsook, Cathi Susan (CPSO#: 33828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite #503 - #504
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 226-4294
Fax: (416) 226-1928
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHI SUSAN BORSOOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORSOOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 31 Dec 1982
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1983 to 31 Dec 1983
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1984 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1982