Bortoluzzi, Patricia (CPSO#: 63499)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 2011


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 2011