Boruch, Nadia (CPSO#: 22232)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9I 0A3
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain copies of their medical records should contact Health Information Services at 1-800-775-0093 or info@recordsregistry.ca.
Date Received: 29 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017