Borzecki, Mark Paul (CPSO#: 63568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arnprior and District
Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-3166 Ext. 245
Fax: (613) 623-5703
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Fax: (613) 761-5488
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK PAUL BORZECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORZECKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992