Bos, Hayley Bronwen (CPSO#: 79722)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012