Bose, Reetesh (CPSO#: 109903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: (613) 558-5022
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REETESH BOSE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOSE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BOSE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOSE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BOSE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOSE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOSE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018