Bosey, Morris Gregory Joseph (CPSO#: 77736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital Site
Niagara Health System
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Catharines Oral Surgery
75 Corporate Park Dr.
St. Catharines, Ontario
St Catharines ON  L2S 3W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 704-1449
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Welland County General Hospital
65 Third St.
Welland
ON
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Rd.
Niagara Falls
ON
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Bosey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bosey ( CPSO# 77736 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORRIS GREGORY JOSEPH BOSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007