Bosiljcic-Stojanovic, Svetlana (CPSO#: 83036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Vein &
Cosmetic Medical Clinic
1919 Riverside Drive, Suite 211
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 737-5675
Fax: (613) 737-6499
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Svetlana Bosiljcic-Stojanovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bosiljcic-Stojanovic ( CPSO# 83036 )

Business Address:
211 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 737-5675

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVETLANA BOSILJCIC-STOJANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSILJCIC-STOJANOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007