Boskovic, Radinka (CPSO#: 75880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:Universit of Tuzla, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarington FHO
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radinka Boskovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Boskovic ( CPSO# 75880 )

Business Address:
Clarington FHO
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 632-2355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADINKA BOSKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2011