Bosma, Karen Joy (CPSO#: 72280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
L H S C - U C
Room B2-194D
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3531
Fax: (519) 663-8813
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.J Bosma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bosma ( CPSO# 72280 )

Business Address:
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
Room B2-194D
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN JOY BOSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002