Bosman, Kylie Anne (CPSO#: 79392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Booth, Kylie Anne (used until: 17 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General & Marine Hosp
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kylie Bosman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bosman ( CPSO# 79392 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLIE ANNE BOSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005