Boszko, Andres (CPSO#: 24360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Madrid, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber river hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: 416 2421000
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRES BOSZKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSZKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1976