Botnaru, Tudor Cristian (CPSO#: 108028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room S.1.184
Emergency Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tudor Botnaru Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Dr. T. Botnaru ( CPSO# 108028)

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Room S.1.184
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton


Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. TUDOR CRISTIAN BOTNARU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTNARU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 28 Sep 2015 to 11 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016