Botros, Mary Farid (CPSO#: 81382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ceremonial Medical Centre
223 Ceremonial Drive, Unit 3
Mississauga ON  L5R 2N3
Phone: (905) 507-2224
Fax: (905) 507-2233
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY FARID BOTROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2007