Botros, Yasser Kamal (CPSO#: 71628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 494-0123
Fax: (416) 494-9021
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: 4167566000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York Branson Hospital
555 Finch Ave. West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-9420
Fax: (416) 635-2441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2175 Sheppard Ave. East
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Canada
Phone: 4166385889
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Botros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Botros ( CPSO# 71628 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 494-0123

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASSER KAMAL BOTROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002