Bottas, Alexandra (CPSO#: 72468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Bottas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bottas ( CPSO# 72468 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA BOTTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004