Bottega, Remo (CPSO#: 68019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
41 Caithness Street West
Caledonia ON  N3W 2J2
Phone: (905) 765-9111
Fax: (905) 765-9114
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bottega Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bottega ( CPSO# 68019 )

Business Address:
3 - 41 Caithness Street West
Caledonia ON  N3W 2J2
Phone Number: (905) 765-9111

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0750

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REMO BOTTEGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTTEGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996