Bottenheim, Olivia (CPSO#: 82705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Riverdale CHC
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone: (416) 461-2493
Fax: (416) 461-8245
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Academic FHT
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street, 4th Floor
PO Box 25
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

222 Lansdowne Ave, Suite 200
Toronto ON  M6K 3C6
Canada
Phone: (647) 725-6555
Fax: (647) 725-6556
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Carlton and Church Medical
60 Carlton St
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
Fax: (416) 646-1892
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLIVIA BOTTENHEIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTTENHEIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007