Bottomley, Michael George (CPSO#: 27215)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002