Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bottum, Norman Edward (CPSO#: 55581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7217 Gelert Rd
Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Fax: (705) 457-3955
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heyes ( CPSO# 26112 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: Norman Bottum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
PO Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN EDWARD BOTTUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTTUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1986