Boubez, Ghassan (CPSO#: 69580)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996