Bouchard, Joseph Adrien Jacques (CPSO#: 55297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Foothills Medical Centre
Room 469 McCaig Tower
3134 Hospital Dr NW
T2N 5Y1
Calgary AB  T2N 5Y1
Phone: (403) 944-8236
Fax: (403) 270-3587

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ADRIEN JACQUES BOUCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1985