Bouchard, Joseph Gontran Adrien (CPSO#: 18901)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1999