Boucher, Catherine (CPSO#: 59350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pedopsychiatrie
81 rue Albert
Moncton NB  E1C 1B3
Phone: (506) 869-3450
Fax: (506) 869-3451

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996