Boucher, Claude Henri (CPSO#: 23608)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claude Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016