Boucher, Francois-Gilles (CPSO#: 28462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS-GILLES BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2003