Boudakian, Avidis Hagop (CPSO#: 56730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Urology
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-7120
Fax: (905) 472-2971
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVIDIS HAGOP BOUDAKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDAKIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987