Boudreau, Heather Sarah Ross (CPSO#: 86223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Names: Ross Boudreau, Heather Sarah (used until: 12 May 2008 )     Ross, Heather Sarah (used until: 20 Dec 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Level
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 222-2627
Fax: (705) 222-7246
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. S. Boudreau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Boudreau ( CPSO# 86223 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Lower Level
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone Number: (705) 222-2627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER SARAH ROSS BOUDREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011