Boudreau, Yves Pierre (CPSO#: 61820)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1998