Boudville, Amanda Christine (CPSO#: 78513)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Western Australia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2002 to 14 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2003 to 14 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2004