Boulanger, Bernard Roger (CPSO#: 55808)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2002