Boulias, Christos (CPSO#: 71377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3680
Fax: (416) 243-1177
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Runnemede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Rd
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 762-7316
Fax: (416) 762-3836
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christos Boulias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Boulias ( CPSO# 71377 )

Business Address:
West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3680

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOS BOULIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002