Boulis, Sherif Refaat Shawky (CPSO#: 94759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERIF REFAAT SHAWKY BOULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 17 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2017