Boulos, Carolyn Marie (CPSO#: 54500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4098
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN MARIE BOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987