Boulos, Emily Bridget (CPSO#: 92891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Claydon, Emily Bridget (used until: 09 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Faculty of Medicine
University of Toronto
4th Floor - 263 McCaul Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 864-5422
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY BRIDGET BOULOS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOULOS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BOULOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOULOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BOULOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOULOS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOULOS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018